+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 32
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1423
- House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 806
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 769
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1324 PN 2179, CONCUR
June 27, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1324 PN 2179, FINAL PASSAGE
May 13, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1324 PN 1783, FP
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor