+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 28, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 92
- Approved by the Governor
On December 18, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2222
- House concurred in Senate amendments (180-17)
- Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 2628
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (47-3)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Re-reported as amended
On December 6, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
- Second consideration
On December 5, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1912-1915
- Third consideration and final passage (149-48)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Votes (5)
December 14, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1322 PN 2663, SUSP RULES, REED
December 14, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1322 PN 2663, MOT REV PRIOR PR, REED
December 14, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1322 PN 2628, CONCUR
December 9, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1322 PN 2628, FINAL PASSAGE
November 9, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1322 PN 2453, FP
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor