+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1768-1769
- Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
October 30, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1315 PN 2744, FP
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor