+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 62 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On July 8, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (199-1)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On July 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
July 7, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1312 PN 3334, CONCUR
July 7, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1312 PN 3334, Final Passage
September 28, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1312 PN 1404, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor