+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION