+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1853
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor