+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On October 30, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 47
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 2, 2017 in the House:
- Second consideration
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT