+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 107
On October 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 24, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1284 PN 3816, FINAL PASSAGE
June 25, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1284 PN 3816, FP
June 22, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1284 PN 3121, 2017 A8703, SOLOMON
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor