+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 9A
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1282 PN 1645, FINAL PASSAGE
June 27, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1282 PN 1645, FP
June 19, 2013: House Rules Vote: House Bill 1282 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor