+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 20, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 87
- Approved by the Governor
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2191
- House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1314
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1276
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (4)
December 10, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1279 PN 2613, CONCUR
December 8, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1279 PN 2613, FINAL PASSAGE
June 28, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1279 PN 1967, FP
June 27, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1279 PN 1710, 2015 A2243, KELLER, W.
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor