+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 19
- Approved by the Governor
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Removed from table
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1278 PN 1836, FINAL PASSAGE
June 28, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1278 PN 1836, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor