+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and defeated on final passage (71-120)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Vote
May 23, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1273 PN 1540, FP
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor