+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2120-2123
- Final passage (102-94)
- Vote by which this bill was defeated on final passage, reconsidered (118-77)
- Third consideration and defeated on final passage (101-95)
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (3)
December 7, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1265 PN 2313, FP
December 7, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1265 PN 2313, MOT RECON, LAWRENCE
December 7, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1265 PN 2313, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor