+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
May 13, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1237 PN 1471, FP
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor