+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
November 9, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1229 PN 1614, FP
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor