+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On October 1, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On September 30, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 24, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 23, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Votes (4)
October 1, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1216 PN 1530, FP
September 30, 2013: House Appropriations Vote: House Bill 1216 - Re-report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor