+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 3, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 100 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On October 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (156-44)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final passage (46-3)
- Vote on final passage reconsidered
- Third consideration and final passage (47-2)
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On September 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-committed to STATE GOVERNMENT
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Votes (4)
October 24, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 121 PN 3560, CONCURRENCE
October 19, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 121 PN 3560, Final Passage
October 19, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 121 PN 3560, Final Passage-Reconsidered
April 25, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 121 PN 89, FP
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor