+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
October 19, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1202 PN 1577, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor