+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 2
- Approved by the Governor
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1201 PN 1576, FINAL PASSAGE
October 19, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1201 PN 1576, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor