+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 29
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1200 PN 2567, FINAL PASSAGE
December 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1200 PN 2567, FP
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor