+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 49
- Approved by the Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (188-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1199 PN 1574, FINAL PASSAGE
December 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1199 PN 1574, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor