+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 40
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 24, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1185 PN 3862, CONCUR
June 23, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1185 PN 3862, FINAL PASSAGE
June 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1185 PN 1371, FP
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor