+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Veto No. 4
- Vetoed by the Governor
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 281-282
- House concurred in Senate amendments (112-87)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 261-264
- Third consideration and final passage (27-21)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Re-reported as committed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (118-83)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 675-678
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT