+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1179 PN 1365, FP
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor