+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
- Reported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to INSURANCE
+ − Vote
September 21, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1179 PN 1524, 2015 A8377, COHEN
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor