+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 2
- Approved by the Governor
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 83-84
- House concurred in Senate amendments (194-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On November 14, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1287-1289
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1261-1266
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1175 PN 2801, CONCUR
December 13, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1175 PN 2801, FINAL PASSAGE
July 7, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1175 PN 2201, FP
June 30, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1175 PN 1398, 2017 A1218, NEUMAN
June 29, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1175 PN 1398, 2017 A2376, CUTLER
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor