+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
April 4, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1171 PN 1519, FP
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor