+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2061
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (155-36)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1309-1313
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1271-1276
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 28, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1154 PN 1966, FP
June 27, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1154 PN 1835, 2015 A2251, HARPER
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor