+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 45 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Final passage (49-1)
- Vote on final passage reconsidered
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 697-698
- Third consideration and final passage (183-18)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
June 25, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1147 PN 1202, Final Passage
May 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1147 PN 1202, FP
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor