+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 685-690
- Third consideration and final passage (113-88)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 645-660
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
May 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1144 PN 1199, FP
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor