+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 3, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 131
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (3)
October 25, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1118 PN 4066, CONCUR
October 24, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1118 PN 4066, FINAL PASSAGE
June 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1118 PN 1965, FP
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor