+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1257-1258
- Third consideration and final passage (118-72)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1223-1224
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1112 PN 1798, FP
June 25, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1112 PN 1798, 2015 A2258, MCCARTER
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor