+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 85 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
November 10, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1107 PN 1146, Final Passage
June 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1107 PN 1146, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor