+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 84
- Approved by the Governor
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in House
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Votes (2)
October 23, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1085 PN 1321, FINAL PASSAGE
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1085 PN 1321, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor