+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Vote
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1084 PN 1257, FP
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor