+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 23
- Approved by the Governor
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 822-825
- House concurred in Senate amendments (196-6)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (37-13)
- Re-reported as amended
On April 7, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (188-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1083 PN 3865, CONCUR
May 28, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1083 PN 3865, FINAL PASSAGE
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1083 PN 1256, FP
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor