+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
May 23, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1079 PN 1386, FP
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor