+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 14, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 7, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 657-661
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A939, RYAN
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A907, GAYDOS
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A929, CUTLER
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor