+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 31
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1420-1421
- House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (188-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 940
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1071 PN 1998, CONCUR
June 30, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1071 PN 1998, FINAL PASSAGE
June 8, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1071 PN 1692, FP
June 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1071 PN 1381, 2015 A1708, WARNER
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor