+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 25
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1065 PN 1226, FINAL PASSAGE
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1065 PN 1226, FP
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor