+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1946-1947
- Final passage (188-0)
- Third consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 955-956
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1052 PN 2019, 2019 A4081, SUSP RULES, HANBIDGE
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1052 PN 2019, 2019 A4081, HANBIDGE
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1052 PN 2942, FP
June 5, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1052 PN 1215, 2019 A1585, D. MILLER
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor