+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-3)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 16, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1045 PN 1186, FP
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor