+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 8, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1043 PN 1477, FP
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor