+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT