+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 3, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 99 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (164-35)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (43-6)
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 269 - 271
- Third consideration and final passage (146-56)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 248 - 252
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (9)
October 26, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 3500, CONCURRENCE
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 3500, Final Passage
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5737, Motion to Table SANTARSIERO Amendment No. A-5737
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5784, Motion to Table KEARNEY Amendment No. A-5784
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5840, Motion to Table HAYWOOD Amendment No. A-5840
March 16, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 73, FP
March 15, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A353, BRIGGS
March 15, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A355, SHUSTERMAN
March 15, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A436, SUSP RULES, KENYATTA
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor