+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 535-536
- Third consideration and final passage (125-73)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT