+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (113-88)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 591-594
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
May 24, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1010 PN 1453, FP
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor