+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1258-1260
- Final passage (110-89)
- Third consideration, with amendments
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 959-960
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 24, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1005 PN 2022, 2019 A2397, COX
June 24, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1005 PN 2238, FP
June 5, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1005 PN 1341, 2019 A1645, HEFFLEY
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor