+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 7
- Approved by the Governor
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 196
- House concurred in Senate amendments (192-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 126-127
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 908-910, 912-913
- Third consideration and final passage (191-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 4, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1001 PN 3258, CONCUR
February 4, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1001 PN 3258, FINAL PASSAGE
June 3, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1001 PN 1126, FP
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor