+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 15, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1010)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov. recomm. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2427ER2)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1010 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2427ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 993243309-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 993243309-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 993243309-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 999089309
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor